Chester v. Vannoy et al
Plaintiff: Teddy Chester
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2016cv17754
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 68 motion to continue filed by Respondent is GRANTED. The State must either retry Chester or release him from state custody by no later than 11/15/2018, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/1/2018. (jls)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Teddy Chester's petition for a writ of habeas corpus be and hereby is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 120 days of this Order, the State of Louisiana either retry Teddy Chester or set him free. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix I)(sa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2018: # 2 Certified Mail Receipts) (sa).
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chester v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Chester
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Represented By: David P Voisin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Represented By: Terry Michael Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?