Rockett v. Belle Chasse Marine Transportation, LLC
Plaintiff: Darrin Rockett
Defendant: Belle Chasse Marine Transportation, LLC and St. John Fleeting, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00229
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St John the Baptist
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Associated Marine Anchorage of St. John, L.L.C. and St. John Enterprises, L.L.C.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 69 ) is GRANTED, and plaintiff's claims against them are DISMISSED. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that Belle Chasse Marine Transportation, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Seeking Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims for Negligence and Unseaworthiness (Doc. 70 ) is GRANTED, and plaintiff's negligence and unseaworthiness claims against Belle Chasse Marine Transportation, LLC are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Rec. Docs. 67 , 68 , and 72 are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 9/5/2018. (sa)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 6/2/2017. (ajn)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND REASONS that St. John Fleeting, LLC's 7 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages made pursuant Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure IS GRANTED. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 5/22/2017. (cms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockett v. Belle Chasse Marine Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Rockett
Represented By: Tammy D. Harris
Represented By: Megan C Misko
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belle Chasse Marine Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. John Fleeting, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?