Moore v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robert L Moore
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation, Takata Corporation, TK Holdings, Inc. and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01379
Filed: February 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 98 ) is GRANTED, and all of the claims of plaintiff, Robert L. Moore against Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., and Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/14/2019. (sa)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER AND REASONS denying 99 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/15/2018. (cg)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER AND REASONS granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 53 Motion to Strike. For the foregoing reasons, plaintiff's motion to strike is DENIED, except as to the affidavit of Debra Hatton. The Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE any Louisiana Products Liability Act claims against Toyota Motor Sales, Toyota Motor Corporation, and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America to the extent such claims are predicated on the allegation that these defendants continued to use Takata airbags, knowing of the safety concerns of Takata airbags and inflators, and failed to warn consumers about these dangers. Further, the Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE all causes of action except those arising under the Louisiana Products Liab ility Act, including claims of negligence, intentional tort, breach of contract, breach of warranty, negligent misrepresentation, fraud, and bad faith, as to Toyota Motor Sales, Toyota Motor Corporation, and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/20/2017. (cg)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER regarding 32 and 45 Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. For the foregoing reasons, Toyota Motor Corporation's motion is granted in part. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff serve process on Toyota Motor Corporation within 60 days of this order. Toyoda Gosei's motion is granted. Plaintiff's claims against Toyoda Gosei are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/13/2017. (cg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Moore
Represented By: Charlotte M Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takata Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Keith W. McDaniel
Represented By: Anna F. Scardulla
Represented By: Lance B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Keith W. McDaniel
Represented By: Anna F. Scardulla
Represented By: Lance B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?