Dixon v. General Motors Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Landry Dixon
Defendant: Daniel E. Berce, Steven P. Bowman, Chris A. Choate, Eunice Ponce and Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv04492
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Landry Dixon's 63 Motion to Set Aside Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2018. (mmv)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Individual Defendants' 38 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/1/2018. (mmv)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that GM Financial's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/18/2018. (mmv)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants GM Financial and Individual Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claims is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS GRANTED IN PART to the extent that it requests dismissal of Plaintiff's claims under TILA and the ADA. IT IS DENIED to the extent that it requests dismissal of all of Plaintiff's claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted fourteen days leave to amend his complaint to allege any additional potential claims and any potential facts regarding claims against Individual Defendants. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/6/2018. (jls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. General Motors Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landry Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel E. Berce
Represented By: Stephen Winthrop Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven P. Bowman
Represented By: Stephen Winthrop Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris A. Choate
Represented By: Stephen Winthrop Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eunice Ponce
Represented By: Stephen Winthrop Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Winthrop Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?