Cerigny et al v. Joseph Thomas Cappadora, CPA et al
Plaintiff: Donna Cerigny, Kristie S. Hoots-Meyer and Charles Edward Lincoln, III
Defendant: Joseph Thomas Cappadora, CPA, JT Cappadora, Inc, Child Forensic Advocate Safety Center, LLC, Consolidated Financial Services, LLC, Family Resolution Center, Foundation for the Child Victims of the Family Courts, Jill Jones-Soderman, Kurt E. Traub, Bank of America, US Whistleblower, Unidentified Parties, Yu-Wen Chiu, Chih-Yang Hu and In the Best Interest
Case Number: 2:2017cv11111
Filed: October 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Ivan L.R. Lemelle
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED ORDER AND REASONS. ORDERED that Plaintiff's pleadings at issue are stricken and his claims in all captioned matters are dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that sanctions are imposed upon Plaintiff in the amount of $75,000.00 for his continu ous barrage of frivolous lawsuits and pleadings filed in this Court. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be prohibited from filing pleadings and lawsuits in this Court, or removing any Louisiana state cases to this Court, until imposed sanctions are paid in whole to the Miscellaneous Fines, Penalties, and Forfeiture, Not Otherwise Classified Fund (Fund Code 109900), or unless leave of court it first granted for good cause. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 2/22/19.(Reference: All Cases) (NEF:Financial)(sbs)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's pleadings at issue are stricken and his claims in all captioned matters are dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that sanctions are imposed upon Plaintiff in the amount of $75,000.00 for his c ontinuous barrage of frivolous lawsuits and pleadings filed in this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be prohibited from filing pleadings and lawsuits in this Court, or removing any Louisiana state cases to this Court, until imposed sanctions are paid in whole to this Courts registry, or unless leave of court it first granted. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 02/06/2019.(Reference: All Cases)(NEF: Pro Se, Financial Unit)(am)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Cappadora's pro se 12 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to a timely amended complaint with detailed factual allegations, not legal conclusions, against the defendant at issue, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/14/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(jls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cerigny et al v. Joseph Thomas Cappadora, CPA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Cerigny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie S. Hoots-Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Lincoln, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Thomas Cappadora, CPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JT Cappadora, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Forensic Advocate Safety Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Resolution Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation for the Child Victims of the Family Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Jones-Soderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt E. Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Whistleblower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yu-Wen Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chih-Yang Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In the Best Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?