Fink v. St. Bernard Parish Government
Plaintiff: Ryan Fink
Defendant: St. Bernard Parish Government
Case Number: 2:2018cv05447
Filed: May 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Bernard
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's 63 Motion to Revoke the Settlement Agreement is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment to Enforce Settlement Agreement is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that should Fink refuse to execute a settlement agreement and accept the agreed-upon terms, St. Bernard Parish is granted leave to deposit $40,000.00 into the Court registry in full satisfaction of the March 26, 2019 settlement in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on July 22, 2019. (mp)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AND REASONS granting 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Ryan Fink's discrimination claim against the St. Bernard Parish Government, brought pursuant to the Americans with Disabilities Act, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. As discussed, his retaliation claim remains. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/20/19. (sbs)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND REASONS denying 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/28/2018. (blg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fink v. St. Bernard Parish Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Fink
Represented By: Dale Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Bernard Parish Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?