Champion Foods, Inc. v. Bell Foods, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Champion Foods, Inc.
Defendant: John Bellini, III, Bell Foods, LLC and Zorta Investments, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv06712
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Case and Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 362 by Bell Foods, LLC re #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Bankruptcy Case Filing)(Congeni, Leo) Modified text on 8/30/2018 (mm).
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Zorta Investments, LLC served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Tobler, Chadwick) Modified text on 8/29/2018 (mm).
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Bell Foods, LLC served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Tobler, Chadwick) Modified text on 8/29/2018 (mm).
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **Page 2 of summons not provided. For future filings, page 2 should be attached to page 1 of summons. Clerk has attached 2nd page of summons. Please use both pages when filing returns of service. No further action necessary.** (mm)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bell Foods, LLC, John Bellini, III, Zorta Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(mm)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Tobler, Chadwick)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7003635) filed by Champion Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Chadwick A. Tobler added to party Champion Foods, Inc.(pty:pla).(Tobler, Chadwick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion Foods, Inc. v. Bell Foods, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bellini, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Foods, LLC
Represented By: Leo David Congeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zorta Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Champion Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Chadwick A. Tobler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?