Rico v. Government Employees Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Maria D. Rico
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company, Leavon J. Robinson and Government Employees Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv06786
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Bernard
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
2 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand (Petition for Damages at R.Doc.1-2) by GEICO Indemnity Company.(Scott, William)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Judge Susie Morgan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #1 Notice of Removal. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary. Also, filing attorney should have entered the Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by GEICO Indemnity Company (Barry, Stephen)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from 34th JDC, St. Bernard Parish, case number 18-0857 "A" (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7009228) filed by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 List of Attorneys and Parties, #5 List of Pleadings, #6 Affidavit Verification) Attorney Stephen R. Barry added to party GEICO Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Barry, Stephen) Modified text on 7/20/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rico v. Government Employees Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Stephen R. Barry
Represented By: Daphne P. McNutt
Represented By: William B. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leavon J. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D. Rico
Represented By: Joyce D. Young
Represented By: Nicholas N.S. Cusimano
Represented By: Michael C Ginart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?