In Re: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Petitioner: Bradley Lance Person
Interested Party: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, David Jones, Keyla Gonzales, Daniella Desouza, Jennifer Guidry Chauvin, Rodrick Sherrod, National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, Claimant(s), Solma Almendarez, Marcus Tate, Daniella Marciel De Souza, Christina Tate, Jenyfer Espinal Almendarez, Princess Sherrod, Kenia Gonzalez, Glenny Berroa, Fatima Berroa, Emiliano Acosta, Nicholas Saale and Mariela Bardales
Case Number: 2:2018cv06851
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
2 Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
3 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 14 Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Bradley Lance Person for the following reason: Filed in Error; receipt number 053L-7041581; 053L-7041037. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Person, Bradley)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that there be Judgment against Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc. dismissing its Motion for Order Withdrawing the Reference for Contingent, Unliquidated Personal Injury and Wrongful Death Claims (Doc. #1 ). Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/22/2018. (cc: Bankruptcy Court)(sa)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Rec. Doc. #1 Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw Reference is DENIED, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/22/2018. (cc: Bankruptcy Court) (sa)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael J. Remondet, Jr. to be substituted in place of Bradley J. Luminais, Jr. by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to substitute counsel of record)Attorney Michael J. Remondet, Jr added to party Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company(pty:ip).(Remondet, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Claimant(s) re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Bankruptcy Court Order, #2 Exhibit 2 Bankruptcy Court Opinion)(Parsons, Barbara)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 Amendment/Supplement to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Supplemental Designation of Documents of the Bankruptcy Court Record filed by Claimants. (sa)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to File Supplemental Designation of Documents. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/15/2018. (sa)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION File Supplemental Designation of Documents of the Bankruptcy Court Record by Claimant(s). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 20, #3 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 56, #4 Proposed Pleading BK Doc.62, #5 Proposed Pleading BK Doc.68, #6 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 87, #7 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 88, #8 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 89, #9 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 113, #10 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 115, #11 Proposed Pleading BK Doc.120, #12 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 121, #13 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 139, #14 Proposed Pleading BK Doc.141, #15 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 181, #16 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 182, #17 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 192, #18 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 247, #19 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 262, #20 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 263, #21 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 285, #22 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 288, #23 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 294, #24 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 295, #25 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 306, #26 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 312, #27 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 314, #28 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 324, #29 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 331, #30 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 332, #31 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 333, #32 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 353, #33 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 355, #34 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 356, #35 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 359, #36 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 361, #37 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 362, #38 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 380, #39 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 381, #40 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 382, #41 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 383, #42 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 384, #43 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 385, #44 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 391, #45 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 394, #46 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 406, #47 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 407, #48 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 408, #49 Proposed Pleading BK Doc. 409)(Parsons, Barbara)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE AS A NEW CIVIL ACTION*** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from USBC, EDLA, case number Adv. No. 17-10698 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7041581) filed by Howard J. Rush, Edward S. Schmidt, David Ray Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings A, #3 B)Attorney Bradley Lance Person added to party Edward S. Schmidt(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley Lance Person added to party David Ray Wallace(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley Lance Person added to party Howard J. Rush(pty:dft).(Person, Bradley) (Duplicate Filing fee payment $400, receipt number 053L-7041037) Modified on 8/3/2018 (lag).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Withdraw Reference (Doc. #1 ). IT IS ORDERED that the deadline within which Claimants may file responsive pleadings to Doc. #1 is extended an additional ten (10) days, from August 7, 2018 to August 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/30/2018. (sa)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference , MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Claimant(s). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parsons, Barbara)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw Reference (Rec. Doc. #1 ) is hereby scheduled for submission on August 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/26/2018.(sa)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is hereby transferred to Section S/3. Case transferred to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/23/2018.(mmv) (NEF: J. Lemmon, J. Brown, MJ vanMeerveld, MJ Knowles, Case Mgrs)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Transmittal Letter, #35 Docket Sheet) (Judge Jerry A. Brown)(mmv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Wallace
Represented By: Richard Theodore Haik, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Luminais, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Remondet, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: David Jones
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Represented By: M Paul Skrabanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Keyla Gonzales
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Represented By: Miguel A. Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Daniella Desouza
Represented By: Christopher McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jennifer Guidry Chauvin
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Represented By: H. Edward Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Rodrick Sherrod
Represented By: Kenneth H. Hooks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Liability and Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Debra J. Fischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Claimant(s)
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Solma Almendarez
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Represented By: Edward Lee Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Marcus Tate
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Represented By: Pride Justin Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Daniella Marciel De Souza
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Christina Tate
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jenyfer Espinal Almendarez
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Princess Sherrod
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kenia Gonzalez
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Glenny Berroa
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Fatima Berroa
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Emiliano Acosta
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nicholas Saale
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Represented By: Richard Theodore Haik, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mariela Bardales
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bradley Lance Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?