Uzee et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Atney R. Uzee, Philip A. Uzee, Denise A Uzee and Kathleen A. Uzee
Defendant: J. Melton Garrett, Owens-Illinois, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Travelers Indemnity Company, American Motorists Insurance Company, Trinity Industries, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, American Employers Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Lamorak Insurance Company, Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., OneBeacon Insurance Company, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, John David Roberts, AIG Property Casualty Company, American Employers' Insurance Company, International Paper Company and CBS Corporation
3Rd Party Defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06856
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
0 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
1 Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 42 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eagle, Inc. (Oubre, Louis)
September 13, 2018 Filing 41 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McCarty Corporation (Oubre, Louis)
September 12, 2018 Filing 40 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2018 before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Plaintiffs' MOTION to Remand (Rec. Doc. #4 ) was argued by counsel and taken under submission by the Court. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (sa)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that oral argument previously set for September 5, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. regarding #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court is CONTINUED AND RESET for 9/12/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Further Ordered that this order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm)
August 22, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and to the Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 8/23/2018 (sa).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that oral argument previously set on the Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. #4 ) for August 29, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. is CONTINUED and RESET for September 5, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party is limited to 7 minutes of argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 4). Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/21/2018.(sa)
August 9, 2018 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Denise A Uzee, Kathleen A. Uzee, Philip A. Uzee re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10)(ecm)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
August 8, 2018 Filing 34 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #33 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand. **The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word Proposed but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document.** (sbs)
August 8, 2018 Filing 33 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand by Denise A Uzee, Kathleen A. Uzee, Philip A. Uzee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Proposed Order)(Colley, Christopher) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (sbs).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Individually and as sii to Owens-Illinois Glass Company) dismissed. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/8/2018. (cg)
August 8, 2018 Filing 31 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #29 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #30 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Documents contain incorrect Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section H, Magistrate (1). ALSO, filing attorney did not enter National Amusements, Inc., and NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC, as corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (sbs).
August 7, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Cross-Claims and Third-Party Demands of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. and J. Melton Garrett by CBS Corporation. Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft).(Long, Kelly) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (sbs).
August 7, 2018 Filing 29 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc.; identifying Corporate Parent NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation. (Long, Kelly) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (sbs).
August 7, 2018 Filing 28 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #27 MOTION to Dismiss. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss Party. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (sbs)
August 6, 2018 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Owens-Illinois, Inc., Without Prejudice by Owens-Illinois, Inc., Kathleen A. Uzee, Denise A Uzee, Philip A. Uzee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Watkins, Walter) Modified text on 8/7/2018 (sbs).
August 6, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer and Defenses to Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Trinity Industries, Inc. (Arras, Barbara)
August 3, 2018 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 2, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Compliance by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., J. Melton Garrett, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Melancon, David)
August 1, 2018 Filing 23 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2018 Filing 22 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Penn, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Answer to Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company.Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Answer to Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Owens-Illinois, Inc..Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party Owens-Illinois, Inc.(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., J. Melton Garrett, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(ecm)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition in Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/1/18. (ecm)
July 31, 2018 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., J. Melton Garrett, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that #5 Request for Oral Argument is GRANTED, and Oral Argument on the Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. #4 ) is SET for August 29, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party is limited to 7 minutes of argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. #4 ), and all briefs shall be submitted by August 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/30/2018.(sa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 15 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Denise A Uzee, Kathleen A. Uzee, Philip A. Uzee, in Support of #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7)(ecm)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
July 30, 2018 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Motion to Remand. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk has removed submission date. (sa)
July 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Lee Arras on behalf of Trinity Industries, Inc.. Attorney Barbara Lee Arras added to party Trinity Industries, Inc.(pty:dft).(Arras, Barbara)
July 27, 2018 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Motion to Remand by Denise A Uzee, Kathleen A. Uzee, Philip A. Uzee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit 6 to Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 7 to Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Motion to Remand, #4 Proposed Order)(Colley, Christopher) Modified text/submission on 7/30/2018 (sa).
July 26, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and to the Third Party Demands of J. Melton Garrett and Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 7/27/2018 (sa).
July 26, 2018 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Arthur, Mary)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint Cross-Claim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(Semmes, Mathilde) Modified text on 7/26/2018 (sa).
July 25, 2018 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Semmes, Mathilde)
July 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathilde Villere Semmes on behalf of Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. Attorney Mathilde Villere Semmes added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft).(Semmes, Mathilde)
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Colley, Christopher)
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Denise A Uzee, Kathleen A. Uzee, Philip A. Uzee. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Notice of Submission)(Colley, Christopher)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Lamorak Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (am)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-2770 E(16) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7013140) filed by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Lamorak Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Lamorak Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Trapolin, Edward) Modified text on 7/23/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uzee et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Melton Garrett
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Motorists Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Clayman
Represented By: Patrick A. Talley, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Lee Arras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Rhonda Goode Douglas
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Jasmine Najee Brown
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Employers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Represented By: Travis Layne Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Frances M. Montegut
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Employers' Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atney R. Uzee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip A. Uzee
Represented By: Jeremiah S. Boling
Represented By: Christopher C. Colley
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise A Uzee
Represented By: Jeremiah S. Boling
Represented By: Christopher C. Colley
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Uzee
Represented By: Jeremiah S. Boling
Represented By: Christopher C. Colley
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?