In Re: Richard Edward Hunt
Defendant: Richard Edward Hunt
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Issis R Elwin
Case Number: 2:2018cv07237
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Susie Morgan
3 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Susie Morgan, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadline to File Initial Brief and to Coordinate Appeal by Issis R Elwin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jls)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order: Appellant Brief due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Issis R Elwin re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, and NOTICE of Complete Record received from US Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 USBC Notice of Appeal with Exhibit, #2 USBC Docket Sheet, #3 USBC Pleadings)(jls)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Judge Magner. Copy of Notice of Appeal and Designation(s) of Record received; filed by Issis R Elwin. (Attachments: #1 USBC Orders Appealed, #2 USBC Docket Sheet, #3 USBC Transmittal Letter)(jls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Richard Edward Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Edward Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Issis R Elwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?