Millet v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Brian K Millet
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv07539
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St John the Baptist
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 9/14/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(ajn)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney General served on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(ajn)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney served on 9/12/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (am)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mmv) (3cc: USM w/cc: Pauper Order & 3cc: Complaint)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is directed to issue complaint and three summonses to the United States Marshal- one each to the United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of Louisiana, the Attorney General of the United States and the Social Security Administration and the Marshal must serve them by registered or certified mail. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) and (i)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/7/2018. (mmv)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. **Document has been reopened as it is no longer deemed Deficient.** (mmv)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 8/31/2018. (clc)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian K Millet. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (clc) Modified to remove deficiency on 9/7/2018 (mmv).
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Brian K Millet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(clc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millet v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K Millet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?