GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company v. Joachin, et al
Plaintiff: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Ebert Joachin and Mariette D Joachin
3Rd Party Defendant: Bowles & Associates, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv07577
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/20/2018. (mm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Extension of Time to Answer. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 3. Pleading on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1 states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. 4. Motion and Order must be two separate PDF images. Motion is the main document and the order is an attachment.** (mm)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Counterclaim by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Schudmak, Shaundra) Modified event/referral on 9/20/2018 (mm). (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/20/2018) (mm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #1 Proposed Order) (mm).
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Third Party Complaint with Jury Demand against Bowles & Associates, Inc, Counterclaim with Jury Demand against GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company by Ebert Joachin, Mariette D Joachin. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service, #2 Waiver of Service)Attorney Joseph F. LaHatte, III added to party Ebert Joachin(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph F. LaHatte, III added to party Mariette D Joachin(pty:dft).(LaHatte, Joseph) Modified text on 9/7/2018 (mm). (SERVICE BY WAIVER)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the fillable purple boxes. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mm)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ebert Joachin, Mariette D Joachin. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ebert Joachin, Mariette D. Joachin (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7052750) filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Attorney Shaundra Marie Schudmak added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Schudmak, Shaundra) (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/10/2018) (mm). (Attachment 6 replaced on 8/10/2018) (mm). Modified text on 8/10/2018 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company v. Joachin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Shaundra Marie Schudmak
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ebert Joachin
Represented By: Joseph F. LaHatte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Mariette D Joachin
Represented By: Joseph F. LaHatte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bowles & Associates, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?