Beall v. Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brock Beall
Defendant: Diamond Offshore Limited, M/V Ocean Blackhornet, her engines, tackle, furniture, apparel, appurtenances, etc., In Rem, Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc., Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Management Company and Ocean Blackhornet M/V
Case Number: 2:2018cv07663
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record Michelle Cumberland. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/04/2018. (am)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Brock Beall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michelle Purchner Cumberland added to party Brock Beall(pty:pla).(Cumberland, Michelle) Modified on 10/4/2018 (cg).
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Diamond Offshore Limited identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc. for Diamond Offshore Limited (Baynham, Thomas)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Diamond Offshore Limited.Attorney Thomas Patrick Baynham added to party Diamond Offshore Limited(pty:dft).(Baynham, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION to Strike; Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. ALSO, the submission date was change to 10/10/2018 for the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. (cg)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by Brock Beall. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Healy, George) Modified text, referral and submission date on 9/13/2018 (cg).
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Management Company identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc. for Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Management Company (Baynham, Thomas)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Management Company.Attorney Thomas Patrick Baynham added to party Diamond Offshore Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Patrick Baynham added to party Diamond Offshore Management Company(pty:dft).(Baynham, Thomas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Diamond Offshore Company served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Healy, George)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Diamond Offshore Management Company served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Healy, George)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc., Diamond Offshore Limited, Diamond Offshore Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(sbs)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT against Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc., Diamond Offshore Limited, Diamond Offshore Management Company, Ocean Blackhornet M/V. (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Brock Beall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) Attorney George W. Healy, IV added to party Brock Beall(pty:pla).(Healy, George) Modified text on 8/14/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beall v. Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Offshore Limited
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Baynham
Represented By: Steven Kermit Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Ocean Blackhornet, her engines, tackle, furniture, apparel, appurtenances, etc., In Rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Offshore Company
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Baynham
Represented By: Steven Kermit Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Offshore Management Company
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Baynham
Represented By: Steven Kermit Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Blackhornet M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Beall
Represented By: George W. Healy, IV
Represented By: Michelle Purchner Cumberland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?