Harris v. Gusman et al
Plaintiff: Johnnie Harris
Defendant: Director of Medical, Marlin Gusman and Inmate Green
Case Number: 2:2018cv07685
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Spears hearing is hereby RESCHEDULED for Thursday, 10/25/2018, at 9:15 a.m., before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge. See Spears v. McCotter, 766 F.2d 179 (5th Cir. 1989). Plaintiff shall participate via telephone with the Magistrate Judges office initiating the call. The purpose of the Spears hearing is to examine the basis of plaintiffs claims. FURTHER ORDERED that the Warden of the Raymond Laborde Correctional Center make arrangements to have Johnnie Harris, # 319532, available to participate in that hearing by telephone at the scheduled date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts sent to Warden)(caa)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Johnnie Harris. (ajn)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: A Spears hearing is hereby SCHEDULED for Wednesday, 9/26/2018, at 9:30 a.m., before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff shall participate via telephone with the Magistrate Judges office initiating the call. The purpose of the Spears hearing is to examine the basis of plaintiffs claims. Freeman Matthews, counsel for Sheriff Gusman, is hereby ORDERED to have Johnnie Harris, #2469979, made available by telephone for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 8/29/2018.(caa)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $4.63 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Johnnie Harris in monthly payments as set out in document. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 8/29/2018. (cc: Warden Orleans Justice Center)(caa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnnie Harris. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (ajn)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Director of Medical, Inmate Green, Marlin Gusman filed by Johnnie Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Deficiency cured)(ajn)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/5/2018. (ajn)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT*** COMPLAINT against Marlin Gusman, Director of Medical and Inmate Green filed by Johnnie Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Gusman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin Gusman
Represented By: Timothy R. Richardson
Represented By: Freeman Rudolph Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?