Johnson v. Investor Equities, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Betty Jean Johnson and Betty J Johnson
Defendant: Graystar Mortgage LLC, Michael Brown, Investor Equities, LLC and Graystar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv07930
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS ORDERED that Graystar Mortgage, L.L.C. is granted through and including October 24, 2018 within which to file responsive pleadings in response to the Complaint for Rescission, Damages, and Declaratory Relief filed by Plaintiff, Betty Johnson. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 10/2/2018. (sa)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Graystar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David J. Halpern added to party Graystar Mortgage, LLC(pty:dft).(Halpern, David)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Investor Equities, LLC answer due 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (ecm) (ecm). Modified on 10/1/2018 to attach pdf of Order (ecm).
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Investor Equities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Mark R. Deethardt added to party Investor Equities, LLC(pty:dft).(Deethardt, Mark)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Graystar Mortgage, LLC served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (sa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Investor Equities, LLC served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (sa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Michael Brown served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (sa)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael Brown, Graystar Mortgage LLC, Investor Equities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Pauper Letter)(mmv) (Sms w/Pauper Ltr sent via US Mail to Plaintiff c/o Atty)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/21/2018. (mmv)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Sartorio, Anthony) (Main document split out and page 2 of Summons added) Modified on 8/21/2018 (sa).
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Betty J Johnson. Motion referred to Magistrate Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit IFP Application, #4 Affidavit Financial Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Social Security Award Letter, #6 Exhibit Food Stamps Award Letter)(Sartorio, Anthony) Modified referral on 8/21/2018 (sa).
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Betty J Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Anthony Francis Sartorio added to party Betty J Johnson(pty:pla).(Sartorio, Anthony) Modified text on 8/21/2018 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Investor Equities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graystar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investor Equities, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Deethardt
Represented By: Stephen Winthrop Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graystar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Richard B Crohan
Represented By: David J. Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Jean Johnson
Represented By: Anthony Francis Sartorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J Johnson
Represented By: Anthony Francis Sartorio
Represented By: David Holman Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?