Moran v. Seahawk Transportation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erin Moran
Defendant: Seahawk Transportation, LLC, Run Direct, Inc., National Continental Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Ivan Kirsanov
Case Number: 2:2018cv07938
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Tangipahoa
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
3 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that 18-7938 is consolidated with 18-7924, 18-7791. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/10/2018.(mmv)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Judge Lance M Africk, Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/7/2018.(blg)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Notice of Compliance. **Documents on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (sbs)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance by National Continental Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Giordano, Charles) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/6/2018) (sbs).
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Notice by National Continental Insurance Company. (Giordano, Charles) Modified text on 8/28/2018 (sbs).
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by National Continental Insurance Company (Giordano, Charles)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand, by National Continental Insurance Company.(Giordano, Charles)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. ALSO, filing attorney did not enter Progressive Company as a corporate parent at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by National Continental Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Company, Corporate Parent Progressive Commercial Holdings, Inc. for National Continental Insurance Company (Giordano, Charles) Modified text on 8/20/2018 (sbs).
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by National Continental Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Giordano, Charles)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st JDC, case number 2018-2173 "F" (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7069684) filed by National Continental Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Verification, #4 State Court Pleadings, #5 Consent to Filing by Progressive, #6 Consent to Filing) Attorney Charles V. Giordano added to party National Continental Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Giordano, Charles) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/20/2018) (sbs). Modified text on 8/20/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran v. Seahawk Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seahawk Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Run Direct, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Jairo F. Sanchez
Represented By: Frank Allen Romeu, Jr.
Represented By: Dianna Duffy Willem
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Michael E. Escudier
Represented By: Jennifer Stierman Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Kirsanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Moran
Represented By: Ashley Anderson Traylor
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Anderson
Represented By: Gary N. Boutwell, II
Represented By: Courtney Papale Newton
Represented By: Christopher J. Edwards, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?