Lucien v. Fugar et al
Plaintiff: Rhea B Lucien and Rhea B. Lucien
Defendant: Evelyn Edem Fugar and Christian Victor Fugar
Case Number: 2:2018cv08072
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE to Court by Christian Victor Fugar re #7 Notice of Deficient Filing. (sa)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Evelyn E. Fugar served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (McKenna, Warren) Modified dates on 9/24/2018 (sa).
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Christian Victor Fugar served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (McKenna, Warren) Modified text/deadline on 9/13/2018 (sa).
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #6 Answer to Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 10/3/2018. (sa)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 DEFICIENT: ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Christian Victor Fugar, Evelyn Edem Fugar.(sa)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Christian Victor Fugar adn Evelyn Edem Fugar served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (McKenna, Warren) Modified text on 9/10/2018 (sbs).
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Christian Victor Fugar, Evelyn Edem Fugar. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sa)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (McKenna, Warren)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7078476) filed by Rhea B Lucien. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) Attorney Warren McKenna, III added to party Rhea B Lucien(pty:pla).(McKenna, Warren) Modified text on 8/27/2018 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucien v. Fugar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhea B Lucien
Represented By: Warren McKenna, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhea B. Lucien
Represented By: Halima Narcisse Smith
Represented By: Warren McKenna, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Edem Fugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Victor Fugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?