Scott v. Mandeville City et al
Plaintiff: Amber Scott
Defendant: Greater New Orleans Expressway Commission, Donald J. Villere, Causeway Police Department, City of Mandeville, Nick Congemi, Terry Guillory, John and Jane Doe A-Z, Mandeville Police Department, Scott Huff, XYZ Insurance Company, Gerald Sticker, Unidentified Parties, Donald J Villere and Mandeville City
Case Number: 2:2018cv08175
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Terry Guillory on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018; Mandeville City on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018; Mandeville Police Department on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018; Gerald Sticker on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018; Donald J Villere on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Whitmore, David)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, as to Causeway Police Department answer due 11/5/2018; Nick Congemi answer due 11/5/2018; Greater New Orleans Expressway Commission answer due 11/5/2018; Scott Huff answer due 11/5/2018. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/9/18. (ecm)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, by Causeway Police Department, Nick Congemi, Greater New Orleans Expressway Commission, Scott Huff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Craig R. Watson added to party Causeway Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Craig R. Watson added to party Nick Congemi(pty:dft), Attorney Craig R. Watson added to party Greater New Orleans Expressway Commission(pty:dft), Attorney Craig R. Watson added to party Scott Huff(pty:dft).(Watson, Craig)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Causeway Police Department served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Nick Congemi served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Greater New Orleans Expressway Commission served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Whitmore, David)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued on #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, as to Causeway Police Department, Nick Congemi, Greater New Orleans Expressway Commission, Terry Guillory, Scott Huff, Mandeville City, Mandeville Police Department, Gerald Sticker, Donald J Villere. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(sa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Amber Scott. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Whitmore, David) Modified text on 9/19/2018 (sa).
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Causeway Police Department, Nick Congemi, Greater New Orleans Expressway Commission, Terry Guillory, Scott Huff, Mandeville City, Mandeville Police Department, Gerald Sticker, and Donald J. Villere. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(sa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Causeway Police Department, City of Mandeville, Nick Congemi, Greater New Orleans Expressway Commission, Terry Guillory, Scott Huff, Mandeville Police Department, Gerald Sticker, Donald J. Villere filed by Amber Scott re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Whitmore, David)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7085332) filed by Amber Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Christopher Whitmore added to party Amber Scott(pty:pla).(Whitmore, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Mandeville City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater New Orleans Expressway Commission
Represented By: Bert Joseph Miller
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Villere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Causeway Police Department
Represented By: Bert Joseph Miller
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Congemi
Represented By: Bert Joseph Miller
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandeville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Huff
Represented By: Bert Joseph Miller
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Sticker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J Villere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandeville City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Scott
Represented By: David Christopher Whitmore
Represented By: Lawrence Blake Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?