Jefferson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Shoshanna Marie Jefferson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv08195
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 9/10/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (sa)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served through U.S. Attorney General on 9/11/2018, answer due 11/12/2018. (sa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served through US Attorney Office on 9/12/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (sa)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(caa)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 8/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (cc: Plaintiff)(caa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shoshanna Marie Jefferson. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (sa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Shoshanna Marie Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(sa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoshanna Marie Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?