Phillips-Berry v. Kenner Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Shanta G. Phillips-Berry
Defendant: Apple, Metro PCS Communication Inc, Kenner Police Department, AT&T Corporation, Cox Cable, Verizon Communications, Inc., T-Mobile Corporation and Sprint Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv08235
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
2 Judge: Michael North
3 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 USCA Case Number 18-31067 appealed to U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Shanta G. Phillips-Berry. (jeg)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Shanta G. Phillips-Berry as to #10 Order Dismissing Case. (clc)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IT IS SO ORDERED: that Shanta Phillips-Berry's complaint is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: that Ms. Phillips-Berry is hereby prohibited from filing anything else in this Court regarding her so called claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: that Ms. Phillips-Berry is prohibited from filing any additional complaints or bringing any other legal action in this Court that relate to a conspiracy by the defendants to engage in criminal acts and inflict pain upon her, or the insertion of a device controlled by the defendants. Failure to comply with this Order could result in sanctions, including contempt of Court. The Clerk of Court is ordered to provide this Court's Pro Se Office with a copy of this Order and shall not permit any further filings by Ms. Phillips-Berry. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/18/2018. (Pro Se)(cbs)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 Response by Shanta G. Phillips-Berry to #7 Order. (clc)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 9/7/2018. (clc)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that Ms. Phillips-Berry must seek leave from this Court to file anything into the record. Continued submission of motions lacking any legal basis may result in a greater restriction of Ms. Phillips-Berry's ability to further pursue these claims. Ms. Phillips-Berry is invited to show cause as to why the Court should not restrict her ability to file into the record. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/7/2018.(clc)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Jay C. Zainey, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/6/2018.(ajn)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE-ALLOTTING CASE. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/4/2018.(bwn)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL - IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned matter be re-allotted to another section of this Court. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/31/2018. (NEF: Section E)(sa)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/30/2018.(caa)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shanta G. Phillips-Berry. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sa)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Corporation, Apple, Cox Cable, Kenner Police Department, Metro PCS Communication Inc, Sprint Corporation, T-Mobile Corporation, Verizon Communications, Inc. filed by Shanta G. Phillips-Berry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(sa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips-Berry v. Kenner Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro PCS Communication Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenner Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Cable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanta G. Phillips-Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?