Carriere v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Alyson Michele Carriere
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv08834
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018; U.S. Attorney served on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018; U.S. Attorney General served on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney)(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 10/29/2018 (mm).
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet and the summons requested. The pdf's should not have the fillable purple boxes. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mm)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Attorney General-Jeff Sessions, U.S. Attorney-Peter Strasser. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mm)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7128681) filed by Alyson Michele Carriere. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Social Security Administration)Attorney Wiebke Breuer added to party Alyson Michele Carriere(pty:pla).(Breuer, Wiebke) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/24/2018) (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/24/2018) (mm). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/24/2018) (mm). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/24/2018) (mm). Modified text on 9/24/2018 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carriere v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyson Michele Carriere
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?