HDB Construction, Inc. v. FEDCON Joint Venture et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of HDB Construction, Inc. and HDB Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Western Surety Company and FEDCON Joint Venture
Case Number: 2:2018cv08843
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Stay. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mark this action CLOSED for statistical purposes. The Court will retain jurisdiction and the case shall be restored to the trial docket upon motion of either party if circumstances change, so that it may proceed to final disposition; this order shall not prejudice the rights of the parties to this litigation. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/7/2018. (clc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Joint MOTION to Stay . **Filing attorney did not enter HDB Construction, Inc. as additional filer in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Stay by FEDCON Joint Venture, Western Surety Company, and HDB Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leith, Arthur) Modified filers on 11/7/2018 (jeg).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to FEDCON Joint Venture, Western Surety Company; answer due 11/6/2018. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/12/2018. (clc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by FEDCON Joint Venture, Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Arthur H. Leith added to party FEDCON Joint Venture(pty:dft), Attorney Arthur H. Leith added to party Western Surety Company(pty:dft).(Leith, Arthur)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Western Surety Company served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Pelleteri, Maura) Modified text on 9/28/2018 (jeg).
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; FEDCON Joint Venture served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Pelleteri, Maura) Modified text on 9/28/2018 (jeg).
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Western Surety Company served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Pelleteri, Maura) Modified on 9/27/2018 (clc).
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; FEDCON Joint Venture served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Pelleteri, Maura) Modified on 9/27/2018 (clc).
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by HDB Construction, Inc. (Pelleteri, Maura)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FEDCON Joint Venture, Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sbs)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (ess)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7129332) filed by HDB Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) Attorney Maura Zivalich Pelleteri added to party HDB Construction, Inc.(pty:pla).(Pelleteri, Maura) Modified text on 9/24/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDB Construction, Inc. v. FEDCON Joint Venture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of HDB Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Maura Zivalich Pelleteri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDB Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Maura Zivalich Pelleteri
Represented By: Amy S. Malish
Represented By: Catherine Sens Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Eric J. Simonson
Represented By: Arthur H. Leith
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDCON Joint Venture
Represented By: Eric J. Simonson
Represented By: Arthur H. Leith
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?