Nasset v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kenneth Nasset
Defendant: United States and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv09253
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jrc)
October 18, 2018 Filing fee paid from All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7180323) (Vasquez, Jessica)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 10/15/2018. (ajn)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Vasquez, Jessica)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Nasset. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Application to Proceed IFP)(Vasquez, Jessica) Modified text on 10/9/2018 to add referral to magistrate judge (ajn).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Kenneth Nasset. (Attachments: #1 Summons to US Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney for EDLA)Attorney Jessica Michelle Vasquez added to party Kenneth Nasset(pty:pla).(Vasquez, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasset v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Nasset
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?