Mann et al v. Alston Contractors, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Franklin Bell and Erika Mann
Defendant: Kenneth D Ross, Robert Ingram Prichard, IV, Alston Contractors, Inc. and Companion Specialty Insurance Company
Undetermined: Companion Speciality Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv09284
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Companion Specialty Insurance Company served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Waid, Raymond)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Kenneth D Ross served on 11/25/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Waid, Raymond)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Robert Ingram Prichard, IV served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Waid, Raymond)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Alston Contractors, Inc. served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Waid, Raymond)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alston Contractors, Inc., Companion Specialty Insurance Company, Robert Ingram Prichard, IV, Kenneth D Ross. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(sa)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (ess)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7157694) filed by Erika Mann, Franklin Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)Attorney Raymond T. Waid added to party Franklin Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Raymond T. Waid added to party Erika Mann(pty:pla).(Waid, Raymond) (Attachment 5 replaced on 10/9/2018) (ecm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann et al v. Alston Contractors, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth D Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ingram Prichard, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alston Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companion Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Companion Speciality Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Bell
Represented By: Raymond T. Waid
Represented By: David Latham Reisman
Represented By: Carol Welborn Reisman
Represented By: Jacques Charles Mestayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Mann
Represented By: Raymond T. Waid
Represented By: David Latham Reisman
Represented By: Carol Welborn Reisman
Represented By: Jacques Charles Mestayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?