Williams et al v. Noel et al
Plaintiff: Trina Daniels Williams and Isaac Williams, Jr.
Defendant: Amelia Gail Noel, Jefferson Parish Community Development and Willie Thomas Noel
Case Number: 2:2018cv09296
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Amelia Gail Noel served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Willie Thomas Noel served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (sa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jefferson Parish Community Development served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (sa)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Amelia Gail Noel, Willie Thomas Noel.(sa)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7. (sa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Re-Issued as to Jefferson Parish Community Development, Amelia Gail Noel, and Willie Thomas Noel. (Plaintiffs picked up from Clerk's Office w/ cc Pauper Letter, Pauper Orders, and Complaint) (mp)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jefferson Parish Community Development, Amelia Gail Noel, Willie Thomas Noel. (Sent to Plaintiffs via USPS w/ cc Pauper Order, Pauper Letter, & Complaint) (mp)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that the #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Trina Daniels Williams is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on October 10, 2018. (mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: ORDERED that the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Isaac Williams Jr. is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on October 10, 2018. (mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp).
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Trina Daniels Williams. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sa)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Isaac Williams, Jr. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sa)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jefferson Parish Community Development, Amelia Gail Noel, Willie Thomas Noel filed by Isaac Williams, Jr, Trina Daniels Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(sa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Noel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelia Gail Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish Community Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Thomas Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Daniels Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?