Currie v. Francys Johnson, et al
Plaintiff: Bernadette Currie
Defendant: Francys Johnson, GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv09298
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant GEICO General Insurance Company's #5 Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Venue requesting transfer of the case from the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana, or that the case be dismissed without prejudice, is GRANTED and the above captioned case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/15/2018.(mmv)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Transfer Case by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, William)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **1. Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary. 2. Filing attorney did not enter GEICO Corporation as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by GEICO General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., GEICO Corporaton for GEICO General Insurance Company (Barry, Stephen) Modified corporate parents on 10/9/2018 (mm).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, case number C-673172-23 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7157965) filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Statement, #4 Statement, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit List of Attorneys and Parties, #7 Exhibit List of Pleadings, #8 Exhibit Verification)Attorney Stephen R. Barry added to party GEICO General Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Barry, Stephen) Modified text on 10/9/2018 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currie v. Francys Johnson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Currie
Represented By: Peyton Patrick Murphy
Represented By: Ashleigh Nicole Mazerac
Represented By: Troy D. Morain
Represented By: Brian L McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francys Johnson
Represented By: Russell L. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen R. Barry
Represented By: Daphne P. McNutt
Represented By: William B. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Stephen Dale Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?