Seabrook v. Collecto Inc.
Plaintiff: Brock Seabrook
Defendant: Collecto Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09330
Filed: October 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2018 03:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (gec)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Collecto Inc. Corporate Parents are: EOS Holdings, EOS International Beteiligungs-Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH, (Alltmont, Michael) Modified corporate parents on 11/21/2018 (cg).
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Collecto Inc..(Alltmont, Michael)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Collecto Inc. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file any responsive pleadings not later than 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/08/2018. (jeg)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Collecto Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael D. Alltmont added to party Collecto Inc.(pty:dft).(Alltmont, Michael)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Collecto Inc. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service Returned Green Card)(Imbraguglio, Niko)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Collecto Inc. (am)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc)
October 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Collecto Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7158699) filed by Brock Seabrook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Niko Angelo Imbraguglio added to party Brock Seabrook(pty:pla).(Imbraguglio, Niko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seabrook v. Collecto Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Seabrook
Represented By: Niko Angelo Imbraguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Alltmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?