Nocentelli v. United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: Leo Nocentelli
Defendant: United States of America Through Office of Chief Counsel Department of Veterans Affairs Continental East, U.S. Attorney Eastern District of Louisiana, Attorney General of the United States U.S. Department of Justice, Jared M Vincent, M.D., United States of America and Jared Vincent
Intervenor Plaintiff: Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP
Case Number: 2:2018cv09414
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP.(sa)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Intervene. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall accept Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP's Complaint of Intervention into the record. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/3/2018. (sa)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 MOTION to Intervene . **The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word Proposed but only reflect Order on the actual document.** (mm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Intervene by Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Complaint of Intervention) Attorney Robert A. Kutcher added to party Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP(pty:intv).(Kutcher, Robert)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Leo Nocentelli Notice of Change of Affiliation. (Wagar, Nelson)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jared Vincent served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Wagar, Nelson)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Summons Returned Executed. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney Eastern District of Louisiana served on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Wagar, Nelson) Modified text/answer due date/event on 10/29/2018 (mm).
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney Office served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Wagar, Nelson) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mm).
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the fillable purple boxes. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (mm)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney filed by Leo Nocentelli re #1 Complaint. (Wagar, Nelson) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/22/2018) (mm).
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **For future filings, the complaint should be filed as the main document and the civil cover sheet as an attachment to the main document. Re: #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance. Documents were improperly formatted and were blank. IMPORTANT: Please refile corrected summons for issuance.** (mm)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jared Vincent, M.D. (mm)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Jared M Vincent, M.D. filed by Leo Nocentelli re #1 Complaint. (Wagar, Nelson)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Wagar, Nelson) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/11/2018) (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/11/2018) (mm). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/11/2018) (mm). (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/11/2018) (mm).
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7164721) filed by Leo Nocentelli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nelson W. Wagar, III added to party Leo Nocentelli(pty:pla).(Wagar, Nelson) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/11/2018) (mm). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/11/2018) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nocentelli v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Through Office of Chief Counsel Department of Veterans Affairs Continental East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney Eastern District of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared M Vincent, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Nocentelli
Represented By: Nelson W. Wagar, III
Represented By: Sarah W. Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP
Represented By: Robert A. Kutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?