Roberts v. Metzinger
Plaintiff: Ms. Tiffany Roberts and Tiffany Roberts
Defendant: Dr. Stephen E. Metzinger and Stephen Metzinger
Case Number: 2:2018cv09423
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/6/2018. (mm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint by Stephen Metzinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Camille R. Bryant added to party Stephen Metzinger(pty:dft).(Bryant, Camille)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Declaration. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Response/Reply. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event and linking it to the correct document.** (mm)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Declaration. **The exhibit should have been filed as a separate attachment to the Declaration. Clerk took corrective action by separating the exhibit out and attaching it to the Declaration as a separate attachment.** (mm)
November 23, 2018 Filing 7 Response/Reply by Tiffany Roberts to #6 Order Summary Judgment Type Evidence of Damages (O'Shesky, Julie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #1 Exhibit) (mm). Modified text/linkage on 11/26/2018 (mm).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff submit summary-judgment-type evidence regarding the amount in controversy at the time that the Complaint was filed, October 11, 2018, to the Court by November 23, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/23/2018.(mmv)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **This document was filed in error. See rec. doc 2 for correct complaint.** (mm)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stephen Metzinger. (mm)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Stephen E. Metzinger (Fee previously paid) filed by Tiffany Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Shesky, Julie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 FILED IN ERROR: SEE REC DOC 2 - COMPLAINT with jury demand against Stephen E. Metzinger (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7165841) filed by Tiffany Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky added to party Tiffany Roberts(pty:pla).(O'Shesky, Julie) Modified text on 10/12/2018 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Metzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Tiffany Roberts
Represented By: Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Roberts
Represented By: Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky
Represented By: John A. Venezia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Stephen E. Metzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Metzinger
Represented By: Camille R. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?