United States of America v. Little
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Carl J Little and Carl J. Little
Case Number: 2:2018cv09599
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1087
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Carl J. Little. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(am)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Carl J. Little on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Mansfield, Peter) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (am).
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carl J Little (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Peter M. Mansfield added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Mansfield, Peter) WILL REQUEST WAIVER OF SERVICE. Modified text on 10/22/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl J Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl J. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?