Lutz v. Wilson
Plaintiff: Susan Lutz
Defendant: Sandra Wilson
Case Number: 2:2018cv09631
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Lutz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(am)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on November 7, 2018. (mp)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Sandra Wilson filed by Susan Lutz. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Susan Lutz. (am)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Lutz. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Original Motion)(am)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 11/7/2018. (am) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/17/2018) (am).
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Lutz. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (am) Modified on 10/17/2018 (am).
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT**COMPLAINT against Sandra Wilson filed by Susan Lutz. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(am) Modified on 10/17/2018 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lutz v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?