Jackson et al v. Lopinto et al
Plaintiff: Robert Jackson, Jr., Lisa Jackson Noonan, Melissa Jackson, Robert Jackson, Sr. and Robert Jackson, Jr
Defendant: Lieutenant George Gutierrez, SHERIFF Joseph Lopinto, Officer Jerome Green, Officer Jeffrey Hochman, Sergeant Rodney Naumann, Jerome Green, Sr., George Gutierrez, Jerome Green, Gary Cade, Joseph P. Lopinto, III, Jeffrey Hochman, G Cade, Rodney Naumann and Joseph Lopinto
Undetermined: Sergeant G Cade
Case Number: 2:2018cv09688
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Status Conference set for 1/8/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 6/24/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(sbs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Gary Cade, Jerome Green, Sr., George Gutierrez, Jeffrey Hochman, Joseph Lopinto, III, Rodney Naumann. Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Gary Cade(pty:dft), Jerome Green, Sr.(pty:dft), George Gutierrez(pty:dft), Jeffrey Hochman(pty:dft), Rodney Naumann(pty:dft).(Martiny, Daniel) Modified text and filers on 11/13/2018 (sbs).
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to G Cade, Jerome Green, George Gutierrez, Jeffrey Hochman, Rodney Naumann. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(sbs)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Pratt, William)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Pratt, William)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Pratt, William)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Pratt, William)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Pratt, William)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdfs should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. ALSO, incorrect format of Summons Form. Filing attorney incorrectly listed multiple defendants on one Summons. Summons form should only be addressed to one named defendant (per form). Clerk is unable to issue incorrectly formatted summons. Attorney must refile a properly completed summons for each named defendant in which he seeks service.** (sbs)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joseph Lopinto. (sbs)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (gk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Joseph Lopinto, Jerome Green, Jeffrey Hochman, George Gutierrez, Rodney Naumann, G. Cade. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7179685) filed by Robert Jackson, Sr., Melissa Jackson, Robert Jackson, Jr., Lisa Jackson Noonan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) Attorney William Lawton Pratt added to party Robert Jackson, Sr.(pty:pla).(Pratt, William) Modified text on 10/19/2018 (sbs). (Attachments 1-3 replaced on 10/19/2018) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Lopinto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant George Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF Joseph Lopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jerome Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jeffrey Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Rodney Naumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Green, Sr.
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gutierrez
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Cade
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Lopinto, III
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hochman
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Naumann
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jackson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Jackson Noonan
Represented By: William Lawton Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Jackson
Represented By: William Lawton Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jackson, Sr.
Represented By: William Lawton Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jackson, Jr
Represented By: William Lawton Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Sergeant G Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?