Ricks v. Friends of WWOZ, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tabitha Pearl Ricks
Defendant: Friends of WWOZ, Inc., Beau Royster and Elizabeth Arroyo Utterback
Undetermined: Elizabeth A. Utterback and Tabitha P Ricks
Case Number: 2:2018cv09767
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Friends of WWOZ, Inc., Beau Royster, Elizabeth Arroyo Utterback filed by Tabitha Pearl Ricks.(Miller, Caroline)
December 4, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2018. A preliminary conference was conducted in this case on this date. All parties have not consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). A jury trial has been demanded. Accordingly, the presiding district judge is hereby notified so that he may revoke the automatic referral and schedule a conference to set pretrial and trial dates on his calendar. Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be exchanged no later than January 7, 2018. (mmv) (NEF: HON. IVAN L.R. LEMELLE)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the preliminary conference previously scheduled in this matter on December 6, 2018 is hereby RESCHEDULED to December 4, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B409, New Orleans, Louisiana. The purpose of the conference is to plan future proceedings and set dates and deadlines, if appropriate. Parties who wish to participate in the conference by telephone may do so by calling the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers at 504-589-7630. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 11/29/2018.(mmv)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Caroline Hope Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 11/28/2018. (mmv)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Caroline H. Miller (Fee previously paid) by Tabitha Pearl Ricks. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificateof Good Standing, #3 Attorney registration form, #4 Affidavit)(Kraus, Douglas) Modified text on 11/28/2018 (am).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference is hereby SCHEDULED in thismatter on DECEMBER 6, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph C.Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B409, New Orleans,Louisiana. The purpose of the conference is to plan future proceedings and set dates and deadlines, if appropriate. Parties who wish to participate in the conference by telephone may do so by contacting the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers at 504-589-7630 at the appointed time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 11/26/2018.(mmv)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7249889) by Tabitha Pearl Ricks. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Statement Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Electronic Registration form)(Kraus, Douglas) Modified text on 11/23/2018 (mm).
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Friends of WWOZ, Inc., Elizabeth Arroyo Utterback and Beau Royster. Attorney Benjamin M. Chapman added to party Friends of WWOZ, Inc.(pty:dft).(Chapman, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/20/2018 to include all filers (ajn).
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Summons Returned Executed, #8 Summons Returned Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed. **The pages of the summons must be filed in the correct order. Page 1 must go first with page 2 following. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Friends of WWOZ, Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Kraus, Douglas) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/8/2018) (am).
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Elizabeth Arroyo Utterback served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Kraus, Douglas) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/8/2018) (am).
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Beau Royster served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Kraus, Douglas) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/8/2018) (am).
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Friends of WWOZ, Inc., Beau Royster, Elizabeth Arroyo Utterback. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(am)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Friends of WWOZ, Inc. filed by Tabitha Pearl Ricks re #1 Complaint,. (Kraus, Douglas)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Beau Royster filed by Tabitha Pearl Ricks re #1 Complaint,. (Kraus, Douglas)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Arroyo Utterback filed by Tabitha Pearl Ricks re #1 Complaint,. (Kraus, Douglas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
October 19, 2018 Filing fee received from Douglas R. Kraus: $ 400 Receipt No 053L-7182934 (ess)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Friends of WWOZ, Inc., Beau Royster, Elizabeth A. Utterback (Fee previously paid) filed by Tabitha P Ricks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Douglas R. Kraus added to party Tabitha P Ricks(pty:selreq).(Kraus, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks v. Friends of WWOZ, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends of WWOZ, Inc.
Represented By: Hilton S. Bell
Represented By: Benjamin M. Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau Royster
Represented By: Hilton S. Bell
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Arroyo Utterback
Represented By: Hilton S. Bell
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Elizabeth A. Utterback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Tabitha P Ricks
Represented By: Douglas R. Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Pearl Ricks
Represented By: Chelsea B. Cusimano
Represented By: Douglas R. Kraus
Represented By: Susannah C. McKinney
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Lisa Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?