Guidry v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jason Joseph Guidry
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv10033
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA. **Clerk modified Answer due date to reflect the latest date of service, 11/15/2018. Answer due date has been modified to 1/15/2019.** (sbs)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/15/2019; Attorney General served on 11/15/2019; United States Attorney served on 11/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text and service date on 12/21/2018 (sbs).
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration,Attorney General, United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(am)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 **FILED IN ERROR SEE REC. DOC. 1** COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill (Fee previously paid) filed by Jason Joseph Guidry.(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 10/29/2018 (am).
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7195707) filed by Jason Joseph Guidry. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons SSA, #3 US Attorney)Attorney Wiebke Breuer added to party Jason Joseph Guidry(pty:pla).(Breuer, Wiebke) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/29/2018) (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guidry v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Joseph Guidry
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?