Lambert v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Thomas Doyle Lambert
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv10488
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed-US Attorney, #2 Summons Returned Executed-US AG)(Breuer, Wiebke)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sbs)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7213337) filed by Thomas Doyle Lambert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) Attorney Wiebke Breuer added to party Thomas Doyle Lambert(pty:pla).(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambert v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Doyle Lambert
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?