Academy Place, LLC et al v. First NBC Bank et al
Plaintiff: Academy Place, LLC, Patrick T. Bossetta, Sr. and Jean Bossetta
Defendant: SBN V FNBC LLC, Summit Investment Management LLC, Ashton Ryan, Gregory St. Angelo, First NBC Holding Company d/b/a First NBC Bank, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for First NBC Bank, First NBC Bank, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Summit Investment Management, LLC and Ashton J Ryan, Jr
Case Number: 2:2018cv10881
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
2 Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Segrist on behalf of SBN V FNBC LLC, Summit Investment Management, LLC. Attorney Peter J. Segrist added to party SBN V FNBC LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Segrist added to party Summit Investment Management, LLC(pty:dft).(Segrist, Peter) Modified text on 1/10/2019 (sbs).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(ADI)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Response to Court's Directive. **Document should have been linked to the Notice of Removal and not the Court's Directive. Clerk correctly linked documents. Also, Attachment 2 was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image.** (sbs)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 Response to Court's Directive re #1 Notice of Removal by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Garner, James) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (sbs). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/30/2018) (sbs).
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the #3 Motion to Stay, filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Defendant First NBC Bank, be and hereby is GRANTED, insofar as Defendant requests a stay of ninety (90) days. The instant case is STAYED until Wednesday, February 27, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that responsive pleadings be filed by no later than Wednesday, March 20, 2019, at 5:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Ashton J. Ryan, Jr.'s #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead be and hereby is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/29/2018. (bwn)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney should have linked the Motion for Extension of Time to Plead to the Notice of Removal. Clerk properly linked documents.** (sbs)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Notice of Removal by Ashton J. Ryan, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Edward John Lilly added to party Ashton J. Ryan, Jr.(pty:dft).(Lilly, Edward) Modified text and filer on 11/28/2018 (sbs).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal as to Gregory St. Angelo; answer due 12/13/2018. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/21/2018. (mm)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Gregory St. Angelo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James Dalton Courson added to party Gregory St. Angelo(pty:dft).(Courson, James)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2" by 11" inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (sbs)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Directive of the Court regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. By the Clerk.(sbs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Action by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Garner, James) Modified text on 11/14/2018 (sbs).
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-10389 "D-12" (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7228745) filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 State Court Pleadings, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney James M. Garner added to party Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation(pty:dft).(Garner, James) (Attachments 1-4 replaced on 11/14/2018) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Academy Place, LLC et al v. First NBC Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Academy Place, LLC
Represented By: Craig James Mordock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick T. Bossetta, Sr.
Represented By: Craig James Mordock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Bossetta
Represented By: Craig James Mordock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBN V FNBC LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Segrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Investment Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory St. Angelo
Represented By: C. Lawrence Orlansky
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Represented By: Phillip A. Wittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First NBC Holding Company d/b/a First NBC Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for First NBC Bank
Represented By: James M. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First NBC Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Leopold Z. Sher
Represented By: Jacob A. Airey
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Investment Management, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Segrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton J Ryan, Jr
Represented By: Edward John Lilly
Represented By: Edward J. Castaing, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?