Hawk Technology Systems, LLC v. Ross Downing Buick GMC Cadillac, LLC

Plaintiff: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC
Defendant: Ross Downing Buick GMC Cadillac, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv11552
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Lance M Africk
1 Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ross Downing Buick GMC Cadillac, LLC. (sbs)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to Ross Downing Buick GMC Cadillac, LLC filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC re #1 Complaint. (Dantone, Frank)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(ADI)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Frank J. Dantone, Jr. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC (Fenasci, Edward)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Frank John Dantone, Jr. (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7270315) by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 ECF Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Fenasci, Edward) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (sbs).
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 AO 120 Report Regarding Patent & Trademark (lag)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (gk)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ross Downing Buick GMC Cadillac, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7256291) filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Edward L. Fenasci added to party Hawk Technology Systems, LLC(pty:pla).(Fenasci, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC v. Ross Downing Buick GMC Cadillac, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Downing Buick GMC Cadillac, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC
Represented By: Edward L. Fenasci
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Gelpi, Jr.
Represented By: Frank J. Dantone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?