Kogo v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Luke Kogo
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv12926
Filed: December 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
2 Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Luke Kogo. (Gahagan, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(ADI)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re Terminate Deficient Filing Deadline. **Filing attorney entered 12/19/2018 as the service date for defendant. Because defendant is an agency of the USA and service is sent to three separate entities, the latest service date is used. Clerk changed the service date from 12/19/2018 to 12/20/2018. This adjustment does not change the Answer due date. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Affidavit, #3 Summons, #4 Affidavit, #5 Summons)(Gahagan, Michael) Modified service date on 1/2/2019 (sbs).
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 **DEFICIENT** AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael W. Gahagan of Complaint and Summons served on U.S. Department of Homeland Security General Counsel on 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gahagan, Michael) Modified text on 1/2/2019 (sbs).
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sbs)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (ess)
December 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7289122) filed by Luke Kogo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party Luke Kogo(pty:pla).(Gahagan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kogo v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Kogo
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?