Guys, et al v. Braden, et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Carter, Roy Guys, Walter Coleman and Cassandra Duncan
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Charlie Braden and Swift Transportation Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv13893
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 3. Clerk properly linked document to document 1.** (mm)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Charlie Braden, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Rec. Doc. 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit B-State Court File, #3 Exhibit C -Service of Process)(Wallace, Campbell) Modified linkage on 12/31/2018 (mm).
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Charlie Braden, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.(Wallace, Campbell)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Charlie Braden, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. By the Clerk. (mm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-08808 C-10 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7308987) filed by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Charlie Braden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings) Attorney Campbell Edington Wallace added to party Charlie Braden(pty:dft), Attorney Campbell Edington Wallace added to party Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC(pty:dft).(Wallace, Campbell) Modified text on 12/18/2018 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guys, et al v. Braden, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Carter
Represented By: Marcus A. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Guys
Represented By: Marcus A. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Coleman
Represented By: Marcus A. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Duncan
Represented By: Marcus A. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Campbell Edington Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Braden
Represented By: Campbell Edington Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?