Barrios v. New Orleans & Gulf Coast Railway Company
Plaintiff: Tracy Barrios
Defendant: New Orleans & Gulf Coast Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv13943
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by New Orleans & Gulf Coast Railway Company.(Talley, Patrick)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to New Orleans & Gulf Coast Railway Company answer due 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/23/2019. (jeg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by New Orleans & Gulf Coast Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Patrick A. Talley, Jr added to party New Orleans & Gulf Coast Railway Company(pty:dft).(Talley, Patrick)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New Orleans & Gulf Coast Railway Company. (clc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against New Orleans & Gulf Coast Railway Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7311535) filed by Tracy Barrios. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Joseph Mark Miller added to party Tracy Barrios(pty:pla).(Miller, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrios v. New Orleans & Gulf Coast Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Barrios
Represented By: Joseph Mark Miller
Represented By: Benjamin B. Saunders
Represented By: Carisa Renee German-Oden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans & Gulf Coast Railway Company
Represented By: Patrick A. Talley, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Robert Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?