Galloway v. Illinois Central Railroad Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Casey Galloway
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad Company and Illinois Central Railroad, Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv14038
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Summons Issued. **Summons were issued in duplicate. Please disregard duplicate summons filed at record document 6. Please use the summons issued at record document 4.** (mm)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 ISSUED IN DUPLICATE - SEE REC. DOC. 4 - Summons Issued as to Illinois Central Railroad, Co., Inc. (mm) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mm).
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Civil Cover Sheet was submitted sideways. Clerk corrected the image. Please adjust your scanner for future filings.** (sbs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Illinois Central Railroad, Co., Inc. (sbs)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Illinois Central Railroad Co., Inc., filed by Casey Galloway re #1 Complaint. (Stelly, William) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (sbs).
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Illinois Central Railroad Co., Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7315833) filed by Casey Galloway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney William Chad Stelly added to party Casey Galloway(pty:pla).(Stelly, William) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/21/2018) (sbs). Modified text on 12/21/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Illinois Central Railroad Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Galloway
Represented By: William Chad Stelly
Represented By: C. Perrin Rome, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad, Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?