Taylor Energy Company LLC v. United States Department of the Interior, et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Energy Company LLC and Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C.
Defendant: Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, United States Department of Interior, Ryan Zinke and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 2:2018cv14065
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ryan Zinke served on 1/29/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wegmann, Edward)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States Department of the Interior served on 1/29/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wegmann, Edward)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 and #12 Affidavits of Service. Filing attorney used incorrect event. Correct event is Summons Returned Executed. Answer deadlines reset as follows: Bureau of Ocean Energy Management served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019; and United States Department of the Interior served through Attorney General on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (sa)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States Department of the Interior served through Attorney General on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wegmann, Edward) Modified text/event on 1/24/2019 (sa).
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Bureau of Ocean Energy Management served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wegmann, Edward) Modified text/event on 1/24/2019 (sa).
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney Office served on 1/2/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (mm) (Wegmann, Edward) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (mm).
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, United States Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke, Attorney General, U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(mm)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to Attorney General filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wegmann, Edward) Modified text on 12/31/2018 (mm).
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wegmann, Edward) Modified text on 12/31/2018 (mm).
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Ryan Zinke filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wegmann, Edward)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Bureau of Ocean Energy Management filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wegmann, Edward)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Interior filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wegmann, Edward)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Some images filed in attachment 3 were sideways. Clerk has corrected images. Please adjust scanner for future filings. No further action necessary.** (mm)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7316956) filed by Taylor Energy Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)Attorney Carl David Rosenblum added to party Taylor Energy Company LLC(pty:pla).(Rosenblum, Carl) (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/21/2018) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Energy Company LLC v. United States Department of the Interior, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Energy Company LLC
Represented By: Carl David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Edward D. Wegmann
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Represented By: Carl David Rosenblum
Represented By: Alida C. Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?