Evans v. Louisiana State
Plaintiff: Sylvester Larnell Evans, Jr.
Defendant: Louisiana State
Case Number: 2:2018cv14178
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 MOTION to Seal Case MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal filed by Sylvester Larnell Evans, Jr. RECOMMENDED that the complaint of Sylvester L. Evans, Jr. be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim, for seeking monetary relief from a defendant who is immune from such relief, and for improper removal. Objections to R&R due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 2/7/2019. (NEF: Sect L)(caa)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sylvester Larnell Evans, Jr (jeg)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(ADI)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7 (jeg)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sylvester L Evans, Jr. The Clerk of Court is directed to withhold summons until the Court finds that plaintiff has satisfied the following rule to show cause. ORDERED that on or before Monday, 1/28/2019, plaintiff Sylvester L. Evans, Jr. shall file a response containing a written statement of his position concerning this Court's Rule to Show Cause Order and a list of citations of authorities on which plaintiff relies to establish that his claims are not barred by the Eleventh Amendment and that he can put forth allegations that have an arguable basis in fact. The failure to respond in writing as directed will result in the dismissal with prejudice of the captioned complaint on the ground of prescription. FURTHER ORDERED that there will be NO ORAL HEARING, and the matter will be deemed under advisement on the briefs on Monday, 1/28/2019 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 12/27/2018.(caa)
December 24, 2018 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Case, MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal by Sylvester Larnell Evans, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jeg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sylvester Larnell Evans, Jr. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (jeg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number 18-3138 Div D filed by Sylvester Larnell Evans, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(jeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Larnell Evans, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?