Howell et al v. Lake Villas No.2 Homeowners Association et al

Plaintiff: John L. Howell and Elise LaMartina
Defendant: Lake Villas No.2 Homeowners Association, Donald Grodsky, Chaffe McCall, LLP, David J. Messina, Leslie Bolner, Glen Galbraith, U.S. Trustee, Gordon, Arata, McCollam, Duplantis, & Eagan, LLC, Seale & Ross, PLC, David V Adler, Fernand Laudumiey and Gordon, Arata, McCollam, Duplantis & Eagan, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv14332
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - This matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana due to related bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/9/19.(sbs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2019: #1 Transfer Letter) (sbs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/11/2019) (sbs).
January 9, 2019 Filing 19 Second Amended EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by John L. Howell, Elise LaMartina. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sbs)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #15 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/7/2019. (blg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of John L. Howell re #10 EXPARTE Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction.
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Elise LaMartina re #10 EXPARTE Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction.
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 Amended EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John L. Howell, Elise LaMartina. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sbs)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND REASONS denying #10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/3/2019. (blg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7(mp)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to David V Adler, Leslie Bolner, Chaffe McCall, LLP, Glen Galbraith, Gordon, Arata, McCollam, Duplantis, & Eagan, LLC, Donald Grodsky, Lake Villas No.2 Homeowners Association, Fernand Laudumiey, David J. Messina, Seale & Ross, PLC, U.S. Trustee. (Sent to Plaintiffs via USPS w/ cc Pauper Order, Pauper Letter, & Complaints (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons) (mp)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - It appears from the record that this matter is related to Civil Action No. 18-6323, a case before Judge Lance M. Africk. IT IS ORDERED that this case be and hereby is TRANSFERRED to Judge Lance M. Africk, Section I, of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana pursuant to Local Rule 3.1.1E. Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 1/2/2019. (NEF: Section I)(sa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction by John L. Howell, Elise LaMartina. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mp)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp).
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John L. Howell. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elise LaMartina. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John L. Howell. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sa)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 1/22/2019. (sa)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elise LaMartina. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sa)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John L. Howell. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sa)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Elise LaMartina, John L. Howell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Motion for TRO - to be filed after pauper status granted)(sa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell et al v. Lake Villas No.2 Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Villas No.2 Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Grodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaffe McCall, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Messina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Bolner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon, Arata, McCollam, Duplantis, & Eagan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seale & Ross, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David V Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernand Laudumiey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon, Arata, McCollam, Duplantis & Eagan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise LaMartina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?