Lingo v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Dana Lingo
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00102
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Social Security Response Order that Plaintiff's BRIEF is due within 40 days after the defendant has filed his answer, and Defendant's BRIEF is due within 45 days after the plaintiff's brief is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on February 21, 2019. (cc: AUSA,EDLA)(mp)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 2/11/2019, answer due 4/12/2019; U.S. Attorney Office served on 2/11/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return-US Atty. Office)(mm)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(caa)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 1/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (caa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dana Lingo. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (mm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Dana Lingo. (Attachments: #1 Summons-SS Administration, #2 Summons-U.S. Atty. Office, #3 Summons-U.S. Atty. General, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lingo v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Lingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?