Long v. TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cindy Long
Defendant: TNT CRANE & RIGGING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00159
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7. (ajn)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc. (caa)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 1/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (caa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. ***Filing attorney attached a Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to this Complaint instead offiling it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the document and docketing it as a separate entry.*** (ajn)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cindy Long. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ajn)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc. (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Cindy Long. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Application, #2 Proposed Order Order on Pauper, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Natalie Shalane Blackman added to party Cindy Long(pty:pla).(Blackman, Natalie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. TNT Crane & Rigging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNT CRANE & RIGGING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Long
Represented By: Natalie Shalane Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?