Dupart v. Savage Services Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Daniel H. Dupart
Defendant: Tim Callahan, Dwayne Pinell, Savage Services Corporation and Dwayne Pinnel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00203
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Lance M Africk
1 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 27 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #26 Jury Demand. **Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future filings must reflect Section I and Magistrate Judge 2.** (Reference: All Cases)(sbs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 26 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daniel H. Dupart (Reference: 19-203; 19-438)(Richardson, Timothy)
February 28, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Status Conference held on 2/28/2019. ORDERED that Daniel Dupart shall submit his request for a jury trial no later than 3/7/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(sbs)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: As ordered by Judge Africk, a Settlement Conference is set in this case on MARCH 20, 2019, at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B409, New Orleans, Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2019.(Reference: All Cases)(mmv) (NEF: HON. LANCE M. AFRICK)
February 25, 2019 Filing 23 Joint STATUS REPORT by Savage Services Corporation, Daniel H. Dupart (Reference: 19-203; 19-438)(Mann, Christopher) Modified text on 2/25/2019 (sbs).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Due to a conflict in this Court's calendar, the status conference previously scheduled at 10:30 A.M. on 2/28/2019 is RESET to 9:45 A.M. on 2/28/2019. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/20/19.(Reference: All Cases)(sbs)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER consolidating case 19-438 with lead case 19-203. Counsel shall comply, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/20/2019.(blg)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AND REASONS denying #6 MOTION to Remand; FURTHER ORDERED that Daniel Dupart's claims against Dwayne Pinnel and Tim Callahan are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Savage Services Corporation, Dwayne Pinell, and Tim Callahan's request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/20/2019.(blg)
February 13, 2019 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Savage Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Savage Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent Savage Enterprises Intermediate, LLC, Corporate Parent Savage Enterprises Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Savage Companies, Corporate Parent BAE Holdings, LLC for Savage Services Corporation (Mann, Christopher)
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Notice of Related Case(s). **Filing is a duplicate of R. Doc 17 and has been noted as such. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
February 7, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Related Case(s) by Tim Callahan, Dwayne Pinell, Savage Services Corporation of related case(s) 19-438. (Mann, Christopher)
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tim Callahan, Dwayne Pinell, Savage Services Corporation re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mann, Christopher)
February 7, 2019 Filing 15 **DUPLICATE FILING. SEE R. DOC. #17 ** Notice of Related Case(s) by Tim Callahan, Dwayne Pinell, Savage Services Corporation of related case(s) 19-438. (Mann, Christopher) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (sbs).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Sarabeth Taylor Bradley for Daniel H. Dupart. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/4/19. (sbs)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Parties shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/1/19.(sbs)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 6/3/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Bench Trial set for 8/26/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF:Magistrate Judge)(sbs)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Sarabeth T. Bradley by Daniel H. Dupart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richardson, Timothy) Modified text on 1/31/2019 (sbs).
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Daniel H. Dupart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Sarabeth Taylor Bradley added to party Daniel H. Dupart(pty:pla).(Bradley, Sarabeth) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (sbs).
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Notice of Compliance.' ALSO, filing attorney incorrectly linked the Notice to the Directive of the Clerk. The Notice should have been linked to the Notice of Removal. Clerk took corrective action by appropriately linking the Notice to the Notice of Removal. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by Savage Services Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mann, Christopher) Modified event and link on 1/25/2019 (sbs).
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court. **Exhibit was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image.** (sbs)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Daniel H. Dupart. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(Richardson, Timothy) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (sbs). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/23/2019) (sbs).
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 09:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Tim Callahan, Dwayne Pinell, Savage Services Corporation. Attorney Christopher S. Mann added to party Tim Callahan (pty:dft), Dwayne Pinell(pty:dft).(Mann, Christopher) Modified text on 1/18/2019 (sbs).
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Savage Services Corporation. By the Clerk.(sbs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd JDC, Terrebonne Parish, case number 184581 A.(Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7355044) filed by Savage Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher S. Mann added to party Savage Services Corporation(pty:dft).(Mann, Christopher) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dupart v. Savage Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Callahan
Represented By: Christopher S. Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Pinell
Represented By: Christopher S. Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savage Services Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S. Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Pinnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel H. Dupart
Represented By: Ronald Shane Bryant
Represented By: Timothy R. Richardson
Represented By: Sarabeth Taylor Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?