Collins v. Collecto Inc.
Plaintiff: Tarnara Collins
Defendant: Collecto Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00261
Filed: January 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2019 09:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter EOS Holdings USA, Inc., and International Beteiligungs-Verwaltungsgesellschaft MBG as corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/6/19. (sbs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Collecto Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EOS Holdings USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent EOS International Beteiligungs-Verwaltungsgesellschaft MBG for Collecto Inc. (Alltmont, Michael) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (sbs).
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Collecto Inc.(Alltmont, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, by Collecto Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alltmont, Michael) Modified text on 3/6/2019 (sbs).
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Collecto Inc. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Proof of Service)(Imbraguglio, Niko) Modified text on 2/14/2019 (sbs).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Collecto Inc. answer due 3/6/2019. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/12/19. (sbs)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Collecto Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael D. Alltmont added to party Collecto Inc.(pty:dft).(Alltmont, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Collecto Inc. (sbs)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
January 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Collecto Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7356615) filed by Tarnara Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Niko Angelo Imbraguglio added to party Tarnara Collins(pty:pla).(Imbraguglio, Niko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Collecto Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarnara Collins
Represented By: Niko Angelo Imbraguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Alltmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?