Marcus v. Advantage Resourcing America, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Misty Marcus
Defendant: Advantage Resourcing America, Inc and Advantage Resourcing Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00273
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
1 Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Advantage Resourcing America, Inc, Advantage Resourcing Group, Inc. (Desmond, Susan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Advantage Resourcing America, Inc, Advantage Resourcing Group, Inc. Attorney Susan Fahey Desmond added to party Advantage Resourcing America, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Fahey Desmond added to party Advantage Resourcing Group, Inc.(pty:dft).(Desmond, Susan) Modified text on 3/8/2019 (sbs).
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Advantage Resourcing America, Inc, Advantage Resourcing Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sbs)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Advantage Resourcing America, Inc, Advantage Resourcing Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7358504) filed by Misty Marcus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Chad A. Danenhower added to party Misty Marcus(pty:pla).(Danenhower, Chad) Modified text on 1/15/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus v. Advantage Resourcing America, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Resourcing America, Inc
Represented By: Susan Fahey Desmond
Represented By: Amanda Wingfield Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Resourcing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Fahey Desmond
Represented By: Amanda Wingfield Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Marcus
Represented By: Chad A. Danenhower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?